E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/21/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4301
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4075
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2536
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2536
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2536
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2536
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2536
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2535
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2535
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1777
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1353
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#154
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1194
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1194
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/14/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1177
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1177
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/9/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1140
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1140
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|