Senate | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#372 | Journal Page: 1980 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1980 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1980 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1912 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1912 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 629 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 629 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |