House | 05/12/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3273 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1918 | Journal Page: 3272 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1063 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 629 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 629 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |