House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2674 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 270 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 270 | |
House | 11/10/2008 | Filed |