House | 05/12/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3301 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 630 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 630 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |