House | 05/12/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3189 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB917 | Journal Page: 3189 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1093 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 640 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 640 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |