Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1948 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2266 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#467 | Journal Page: 2265 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2265 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2265 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2232 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2232 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2232 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 294 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 294 | |
House | 11/14/2008 | Filed |