Senate | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#335 | Journal Page: 1950 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1950 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1950 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1938 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1938 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 642 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 642 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |