Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2462 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2462


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a county to clarify the existence of a
 public interest in certain roads.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 258.007, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 258.007. APPLICATION [EXPIRATION] OF CHAPTER. This
 chapter applies only to a county that initiates or completes
 compliance with the provisions of this chapter before [expires]
 September 1, 2011 [2009].
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2462 was passed by the House on April
 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2462 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2462 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor