Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2457 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/16/2009 | Record vote | RV#875 | Journal Page: 3728 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3728 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3728 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3712 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3712 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3593 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 644 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 644 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |