Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 997 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | RV#144 | Journal Page: 1174 |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1174 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1174 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1167 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1167 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1034 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 646 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 646 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |