House | 05/12/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3190 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB1295 | Journal Page: 3190 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1276 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 646 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 646 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |