E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR284
|
Journal Page: 6926
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 284
|
Journal Page: 5107
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2808
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5855
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1516
|
Journal Page: 5855
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5855
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5855
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2300
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#425
|
Journal Page: 2184
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2184
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2184
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Patrick
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/29/09 6:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 646
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 646
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|