Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2489 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R10447 BEF-D
 By: Harper-Brown H.B. No. 2489


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the allocation of revenue from the motor vehicle sales
 tax to the state highway fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 152.122, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 152.122. ALLOCATION OF TAX. Subject to Section
 152.1222, the [The] comptroller shall deposit the funds received
 under Section 152.121 [of this code] as follows:
 (1) in the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2010, 50
 percent to the credit of the state highway fund and 50 percent [1/4
 to the credit of the foundation school fund; and
 [(2) the remaining funds] to the credit of the general
 revenue fund;
 (2)  in the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2011, 67
 percent to the credit of the state highway fund and 33 percent to
 the credit of the general revenue fund;
 (3)  in the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2012, 83
 percent to the credit of the state highway fund and 17 percent to
 the credit of the general revenue fund; and
 (4)  in state fiscal years ending on or after August 31,
 2013, 100 percent to the credit of the state highway fund.
 SECTION 2. In addition to the substantive change made by
 this Act, this Act conforms Section 152.222, Tax Code, to the method
 of allocating motor vehicle sales and use taxes in effect before the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.