Senate | 05/05/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2043 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2043 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1880 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2300 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#412 | Journal Page: 2170 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2151 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2151 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 646 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 646 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |