Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1631 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1791 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#283 | Journal Page: 1790 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1790 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1790 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Amended | 1-Patrick | Journal Page: 1756 |
House | 04/23/2009 | Amendment to amendment tabled | 2-Jackson | Journal Page: 1756 |
House | 04/23/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Patrick | Journal Page: 1755 |
House | 04/23/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1755 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Postponed | Journal Page: 1753 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1753 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 646 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 646 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |