Senate | 05/11/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 2093 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2093 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2010 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2554 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Record vote | RV#515 | Journal Page: 2368 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Amendment adopted as amended | 1-P. King | Journal Page: 2324 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Amendment amended | 2-Paxton | Journal Page: 2324 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-P. King | Journal Page: 2324 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 647 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 647 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |