Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2457 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Rules suspended | Rule 2, Section 1(a)(9) | Journal Page: 3785 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3750 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#889 | Journal Page: 3750 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3750 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3747 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Amended | 6-Hartnett | Journal Page: 3746 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | 3-Hartnett | Journal Page: 3746 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Amendment fails of adoption | 5-Woolley | Journal Page: 3745 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3742 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Postponed | 5/15/09 4:15 PM | Journal Page: 3740 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Point of order overruled | Rule 8, Section 3 | Journal Page: 3740 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3739 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3592 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3592 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Point of order overruled | Rule 8, Section 3 | Journal Page: 3592 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3592 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 5:45 PM | Journal Page: 3589 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 3 | Journal Page: 3548 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 10-Hilderbran | Journal Page: 3547 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | 7-Thompson | Journal Page: 3547 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3547 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 6(e) | Journal Page: 3547 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 9-Christian | Journal Page: 3545 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3534 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |