E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6895
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5651
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1466
|
Journal Page: 5651
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5651
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5118
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#373
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 648
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 648
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|