House | 04/24/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1871 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 295 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 295 | |
House | 11/17/2008 | Filed |