Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2521 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2521


 AN ACT
 relating to a preference in state purchasing for certain
 media-related services offered by businesses based in Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2155.444, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (f), (g), and (h) to read as follows:
 (f)  The comptroller and each state agency conducting an
 advertising campaign that involves the creation or production of a
 commercial shall give preference to a commercial production company
 and advertising agency located in this state if:
 (1)  the services meet state requirements regarding the
 service to be performed and regarding expected quality; and
 (2)  the cost of the service does not exceed the cost of
 other similar services of similar expected quality that are offered
 by a bidder that is not entitled to a preference under this
 subsection.
 (g)  For purposes of Subsection (f), "commercial production
 company" means a corporation, limited liability company,
 partnership, or other private entity that includes as one of its
 purposes the production of one or more television, film, radio, or
 other media-related commercials.
 (h)  The Music, Film, Television, and Multimedia Office
 within the office of the governor has exclusive rulemaking
 authority for purposes of:
 (1)  determining whether an advertising campaign is
 subject to the requirements of this section;
 (2)  establishing a bid process for purposes of the
 services described by Subsection (f); and
 (3)  establishing criteria to determine whether a
 commercial production company or advertising agency is located in
 this state for the purposes of this section.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a contract for which a state agency first advertises or otherwise
 solicits bids, proposals, offers, or qualifications on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A contract for which a state agency
 first advertised or otherwise solicited bids, proposals, offers, or
 qualifications before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect when the first advertisement or solicitation was
 given, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2521 was passed by the House on April
 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2521 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2521 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2521 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2521 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor