E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5206
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
1:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|