E | 05/23/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4642 | |
E | 05/14/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3802 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2370 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3673 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3208 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1997 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1481 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1481 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1419 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1872 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Record vote | RV#257 | Journal Page: 1735 |
House | 04/23/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1734 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1712 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1712 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1148 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 649 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 649 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |