Senate | 05/26/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2759 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2352 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2352 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2239 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | RV#704 | Journal Page: 3056 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3056 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3056 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3020 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3020 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 650 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 650 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |