E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4819
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4307
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#158
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Eissler
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|