E
|
05/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
E
|
05/08/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2687
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2100
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2100
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2100
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2100
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2100
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2100
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2100
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#225
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Frost
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|