Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2563 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R10286 KKA-D
 By: Paxton H.B. No. 2563


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to determination of and notification regarding the state
 compression percentage under the public school finance system and
 the elimination of property taxes for school district maintenance
 and operations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 42.2516, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (a-1) and adding Subsection (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a) In this section, "state compression percentage" means
 the percentage, as determined by the commissioner in consultation
 with the Legislative Budget Board, of a school district's adopted
 maintenance and operations tax rate for the 2005 tax year that
 serves as the basis for state funding for tax rate reduction under
 this section. The commissioner, in consultation with the
 Legislative Budget Board, shall determine the state compression
 percentage for each school year based on the percentage by which a
 district is able to reduce the district's maintenance and
 operations tax rate for that year, as compared to the district's
 adopted maintenance and operations tax rate for the 2005 tax year,
 as a result of state funds appropriated for distribution under this
 section for that year from the property tax relief fund established
 under Section 403.109, Government Code, or from another funding
 source available for school district property tax relief.
 (a-1) For the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2009, the
 state compression percentage is 66.67 percent. For each subsequent
 state fiscal year, the state compression percentage is the lesser
 of:
 (1)  the percentage determined in accordance with
 Subsection (a); or
 (2)  the state compression percentage for the preceding
 state fiscal year.
 (a-2)  Not later than March 1 of each year, the commissioner
 shall:
 (1)  inform school districts of the state compression
 percentage for the following school year; and
 (2)  post the state compression percentage for the
 following school year on the agency's website. [Subsection (a)
 applies beginning with the state fiscal year ending August 31,
 2009.    For the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2007, the state
 compression percentage is 88.67 percent.    For the state fiscal year
 ending August 31, 2008, the state compression percentage is 66.67
 percent.    This subsection expires September 1, 2009.]
 SECTION 2. Section 45.002, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 45.002. MAINTENANCE TAXES. (a) The governing board of
 an independent school district, including the city council or
 commission that has jurisdiction over a municipally controlled
 independent school district, the governing board of a rural high
 school district, and the commissioners court of a county, on behalf
 of each common school district under its jurisdiction, may levy,
 assess, and collect annual ad valorem taxes for the further
 maintenance of public schools in the district, subject to Section
 45.003.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 45.003(d) or (f) or Section
 26.08, Tax Code, an entity listed in Subsection (a) may, during the
 five-year period beginning with the year in which the state
 compression percentage, as specified under Section 42.2516, is
 zero, impose an annual ad valorem tax for the maintenance of public
 schools at a rate not to exceed $0.17. After that period,
 notwithstanding Subsection (a), Section 45.003(d) or (f), or any
 other provision of this code, annual ad valorem taxes for the
 maintenance of public schools may not be levied, assessed, or
 collected by an entity listed in Subsection (a). This subsection
 does not affect the authority of an entity listed in Subsection (a)
 to levy, assess, and collect annual ad valorem taxes authorized
 under Section 45.001 to pay the principal and interest on bonds.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.