E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1569
|
Journal Page: 6084
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6076
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2927
|
Journal Page: 6074
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6897
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4982
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1071
|
Journal Page: 4981
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4767
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4551
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4551
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4756
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4756
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4756
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4353
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Nelson
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1720
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#355
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Heflin
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|