E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2894
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4664
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1126
|
Journal Page: 4664
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4664
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA1 Nichols
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/21/09 11:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Jackson
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1720
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#381
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
4-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
3-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|