House | 05/14/2009 | Postponed | 6/3/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3528 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3528 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3100 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3100 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Postponed | 5/11/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2479 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2479 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Postponed | 5/5/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2222 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2222 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Postponed | 5/1/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1755 |
House | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1755 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1092 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 819 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 653 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 653 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |