House
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB83
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|