Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2647 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2647


 AN ACT
 relating to the quasi-judicial enforcement of certain health and
 safety ordinances.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 54.040(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) An order issued under Section 54.036, including any
 civil penalties assessed under Section 54.036(5), is enforceable in
 the same manner as provided in Sections 214.001(k), (m), (n), and
 (o). An abstract of judgment shall be ordered [issued] against all
 parties found to be the owners of the subject property or in
 possession of that property.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2647 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2647 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2647 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2647 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2647 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor