E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 06/03/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5153 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6896 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6975 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5212 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2916 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2916 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2916 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2916 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2916 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2916 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2916 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2391 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2391 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2312 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3223 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#752 | Journal Page: 3222 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3222 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3222 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3141 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3141 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3141 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 681 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 681 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Filed |