E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 5041
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4520
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5873
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5873
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1522
|
Journal Page: 5873
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5873
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5200
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#715
|
Journal Page: 3067
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3067
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3067
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
1-D. Miller
|
Journal Page: 3029
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3029
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2300
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 681
|
House
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|