House | 04/27/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 741 | Journal Page: 1905 |
House | 04/27/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1149 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | Journal Page: 681 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 681 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Filed |