E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 05/29/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6040 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4137 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5197 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5129 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3506 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3506 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3506 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3506 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3506 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3506 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3506 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2758 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1950 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#457 | Journal Page: 2259 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2229 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2229 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 681 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 681 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Filed |