E | 05/12/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/12/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3441 | |
E | 05/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2337 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1902 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2296 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 944 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1186 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Record vote | RV#137 | Journal Page: 1137 |
House | 04/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1137 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1137 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1114 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Amended | 1-Ritter | Journal Page: 1114 |
House | 04/07/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1114 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 682 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 682 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Filed |