E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 05/26/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2897 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4640 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4819 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4307 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2628 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2628 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2628 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2628 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2628 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2628 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2628 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1720 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#359 | Journal Page: 1968 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1968 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1968 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 682 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 682 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Filed |