House | 05/14/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3650 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1387 | Journal Page: 3649 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 8:30 PM | Journal Page: 3636 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3636 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 6:00 AM | Journal Page: 3345 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3345 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Postponed | 5/13/09 5:00 AM | Journal Page: 3290 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3290 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 682 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 682 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Filed |