E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
January 15, 2010
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#556
|
Journal Page: 2473
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2473
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2473
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
House
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|