Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2686 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R24773 KFF-D
 By: Shelton, Zerwas, Rose, Pitts, Naishtat, H.B. No. 2686
 et al.
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2686:
 By: Zerwas C.S.H.B. No. 2686


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot project to increase enrollee access to primary
 care services and simplify enrollment procedures under the child
 health plan program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 62, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 62.160 to read as follows:
 Sec. 62.160.  PILOT PROJECT TO INCREASE ENROLLEE ACCESS TO
 PRIMARY CARE SERVICES AND SIMPLIFY ENROLLMENT PROCEDURES. (a)  In
 this section:
 (1)  "CPT code" means the number assigned to identify a
 specific health care procedure performed by a health care provider
 under the American Medical Association's "Current Procedural
 Terminology 2009 Professional Edition" or a subsequent edition of
 that publication adopted by the executive commissioner by rule.
 (2)  "Lower-cost medical setting" means a facility,
 clinic, center, office, or other setting primarily used to provide
 primary care services.
 (3)  "Primary care services" means health services
 generally provided through a general, family, internal medicine, or
 pediatrics practice. The term does not include services provided
 through a hospital emergency room or surgical services.
 (4)  "Service area" means the geographical area
 determined by the commission that is coterminous with one or more
 Medicaid service areas and in which the pilot project is
 established.
 (b)  The commission shall establish a two-year pilot project
 in one or more Medicaid service areas that is designed to:
 (1)  increase child health plan enrollee access to
 primary care services; and
 (2) simplify child health plan enrollment procedures.
 (c)  In establishing the pilot project under this section,
 the executive commissioner shall:
 (1)  for each service area, establish health care
 provider reimbursement rates for primary care services provided in
 lower-cost medical settings that are comparable to the federal
 Medicare program rates for the same or similar services;
 (2)  identify CPT codes that represent primary care
 services for purposes of Subdivision (1);
 (3)  prescribe and use an alternative application for
 child health plan coverage that is written on a sixth-grade reading
 comprehension level; and
 (4)  require any enrollment services provider in a
 service area to reduce application processing delays and procedural
 denials and increase renewal rates.
 (d)  An individual who resides in the service area and who is
 determined eligible for coverage under the child health plan
 remains eligible for benefits until the expiration of the period
 provided by Section 62.102(a), subject to Section 62.102(b).
 (e)  The commission shall provide at least one point of
 service contact in each county in the service area where trained
 personnel are available to personally assist interested
 individuals who reside in the service area with the application
 form and procedures for child health plan coverage.
 (f)  The commission may only enroll an individual in the
 child health plan program under the pilot project established under
 this section during the first year of the project.
 (g)  Not later than January 1, 2011, the commission shall
 submit an initial report to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding
 officers of the standing committees of the senate and house of
 representatives having primary jurisdiction over the child health
 plan program. The report must evaluate the operation of the pilot
 project and make recommendations regarding the continuation or
 expansion of the pilot project. The report must:
 (1) state whether:
 (A)  a higher percentage of eligible individuals
 in the service area enrolled in the child health plan as a result of
 the pilot project, as compared to percentages in other areas;
 (B)  a higher percentage of health plan providers
 in the service area participated in the child health plan as a
 result of the pilot project, as compared to percentages in other
 areas; and
 (C)  the enrollment changes implemented under the
 pilot project:
 (i)  reduced application processing delays
 and procedural denials; and
 (ii) affected reenrollment rates; and
 (2)  include recommendations for the statewide
 implementation of successful pilot project strategies.
 (h)  The commission shall submit a final report regarding the
 results of the pilot project in the manner prescribed by Subsection
 (g) not later than the 60th day after the date the pilot project
 terminates.  The report must contain the information required by
 Subsection (g).
 (i)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary
 to implement this section.
 (j) This section expires January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. Subject to Section 3 of this Act, not later than
 October 1, 2009, the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 establish the pilot project required under Section 62.160, Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.