E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6897
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4988
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4988
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6085
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4790
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4552
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4551
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5654
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5654
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5654
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5198
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3235
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#764
|
Journal Page: 3234
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3234
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 3233
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3233
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Lucio
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 296
|
House
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 296
|
House
|
11/17/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|