By: Rodriguez (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2692 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2009; May 7, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to certain municipal requirements regarding sales of residential properties in certain areas. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 214.905(d), Local Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (d) This section does not apply to: (1) property that is part of an urban land bank program; or (2) a multifamily residential development of eight or more residential units: (A) intended for private sale; (B) located less than one mile from a commuter rail station; and (C) located in a municipality: (i) with a population of more than 650,000; (ii) that has a governing body consisting only of members who are elected at large; and (iii) in which a commuter rail system was approved by an election held after November 1, 2004. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *