Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#620
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
House
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|