Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#230 | Journal Page: 1693 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1693 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1693 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1630 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1630 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1630 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1149 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | Journal Page: 296 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 296 | |
House | 11/17/2008 | Filed |