Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2093 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2093 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1880 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2300 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#412 | Journal Page: 2170 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2152 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2152 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1871 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 696 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 696 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Filed |