E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Comptroller
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4819
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2650
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1720
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 1985
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#377
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
House
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|