E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR293
|
Journal Page: 6958
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 293
|
Journal Page: 5119
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6899
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4996
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 6233
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6232
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4811
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4590
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4590
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5703
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5703
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5703
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA26 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA18 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA25 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
9:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3653
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3165
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2398
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#841
|
Journal Page: 3498
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3498
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3497
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Farrar
|
Journal Page: 3494
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3494
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
57-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
58-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
57-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
52-Parker
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amended
|
51-Hernandez
|
Journal Page: 3397
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
48-Truitt
|
Journal Page: 3396
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 8, Section 3 and Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3391
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3383
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
5-Corte
|
Journal Page: 3358
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3357
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
House
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|