Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2056 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2871 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2459 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | RV#544 | Journal Page: 2460 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2460 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2460 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2443 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2443 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1871 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Filed |