House | 05/05/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2443 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB293 | Journal Page: 2443 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Filed |